WI AB212 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 120.18 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring school districts to report information related to American Indian children attending school in the school district.
Title
Requiring school districts to report information related to American Indian children attending school in the school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |