WI AB212 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 108.04 (11) (br) and 108.04 (11) (cr) of the statutes; Relating to: acts of concealment and misrepresentations in filing for or claiming unemployment insurance benefits. (FE)
Title
Acts of concealment and misrepresentations in filing for or claiming unemployment insurance benefits. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Lassa |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Lassa |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lassa |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2015-12-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Labor and Government Reform and rereferred to committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor and Government Reform |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 34 |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 36 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Jorgensen and Zamarripa |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2015-10-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-10-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2015-10-07 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 4) |
2015-09-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representative Goyke |
2015-09-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2015-09-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Kerkman |
2015-09-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Kerkman |
2015-09-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-09-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-09-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-08-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-06-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced |