WI AB210 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 77.70; to amend chapter 77 (title), subchapter V (title) of chapter 77 [precedes 77.70], 77.71 (intro.), 77.71 (1), 77.71 (2), 77.71 (3), 77.71 (4), 77.73 (2), 77.73 (3), 77.75, 77.76 (1), 77.76 (2), 77.76 (4), 77.77 and 77.78; and to create 20.566 (1) (gh), 20.835 (4) (gh), 77.70 (2), 77.701 and 77.76 (3r) of the statutes; Relating to: an additional local sales and use tax for maintenance of streets and highways and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An additional local sales and use tax for maintenance of streets and highways and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2016-02-09HouseRepresentatives Ballweg and Born added as coauthors
2016-02-09HouseAssembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knudson
2016-02-09HouseAssembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt
2016-02-04HousePlaced on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules
2015-12-10HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2015-12-10HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2015-12-10HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2015-12-10HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2015-12-08HouseExecutive action taken
2015-12-07HouseAssembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt
2015-12-07HouseAssembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kahl
2015-12-04HouseRepresentative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor
2015-12-01HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knudson
2015-12-01HouseRepresentative E. Brooks added as a coauthor
2015-10-07HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knudson
2015-06-10HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knudson
2015-05-12HousePublic hearing held
2015-05-11HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knudson
2015-05-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2015-05-08HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2015-05-08HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback