WI AB21 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
Pending: House Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
Pending: House Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.275 (1) (f), 6.32 (4), 6.33 (4), 6.33 (5) (a) 1., 6.36 (1) (d), 6.36 (1) (e), 6.47 (6), 6.47 (7) (b), 6.48 (1) (d), 6.48 (2) (b), 6.50 (2), 6.50 (2g), 6.50 (2r) (g), 6.50 (3), 6.50 (4), 6.50 (5), 6.50 (6), 6.50 (7), 6.50 (10), 6.56 (3), 6.56 (4) and 7.23 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: removing ineligible voters from the official voter registration list. (FE)
Title
Removing ineligible voters from the official voter registration list. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-06-06 | House | Representative Michalski added as a coauthor |
2023-05-10 | House | Representative Kurtz added as a coauthor |
2023-04-06 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2023-03-28 | House | Representative Neylon added as a coauthor |
2023-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-09 | House | Representative Rozar added as a coauthor |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |