WI AB21 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 281.75 (9) (a); to renumber and amend 20.370 (6) (cr) and 281.75 (9) (b); to amend 281.75 (4m) (a), 281.75 (5) (f) and 281.75 (7) (b); and to create 20.370 (6) (cc), 281.74 and 281.75 (9) (am) to (d) of the statutes; Relating to: testing of private wells, compensation for well contamination and abandonment, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Testing of private wells, compensation for well contamination and abandonment, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2019-04-09HouseRepresentative VanderMeer added as a coauthor
2019-03-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-02-11HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback