WI AB21 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: state finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2015 legislature.
Title
State finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2015 legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to calendar of 7-8-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2015-07-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2015-07-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2015-07-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2015-07-02 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-06-17 | House | Report of joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions received |
2015-06-17 | House | Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions |
2015-05-29 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-27 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-21 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-19 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-14 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-12 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-07 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-05-05 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-04-22 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-04-17 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-26 | House | Public hearing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-23 | House | Public hearing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Public hearing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | Public hearing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-04 | House | Agency briefing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | Agency briefing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-03-02 | House | Agency briefing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab21 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB21.pdf |