WI AB21 | 2011 | September Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.07 (4), 20.536 (1) (k) and 25.14 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 15.07 (1) (a) 7., 15.07 (5) (am), 15.77, 19.42 (10) (Lm), 19.42 (13) (km), 20.195, 25.17 (72), 25.17 (73), 25.90, 73.16, 230.08 (2) (yo) and chapter 555 of the statutes; relating to: creation of the Wisconsin Next Generation Reserve Board and Wisconsin next generation reserve fund, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice, services, and facilities to state agencies and others, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creation of the Wisconsin Next Generation Reserve Board and Wisconsin next generation reserve fund, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice, services, and facilities to state agencies and others, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-13 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-11-08 | Representative Wynn added as a coauthor to Assembly amendment 3 | |
2011-11-07 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-11-03 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2011-11-03 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Craig and Jacque | |
2011-11-03 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Marklein | |
2011-11-03 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Marklein | |
2011-11-03 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-11-01 | Referred to Calendar 11-3-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 | |
2011-11-01 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 2 | |
2011-11-01 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2011-10-24 | Executive action taken | |
2011-10-24 | Public hearing held | |
2011-10-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-10-24 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Marklein | |
2011-10-20 | Senator Taylor added as a cosponsor | |
2011-10-18 | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor | |
2011-10-18 | Representatives Marklein, Molepske Jr and Kooyenga added as coauthors | |
2011-10-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions | |
2011-10-18 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/se1/asm/bill/ab21 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/SE1/AB21.pdf |