WI AB208 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 343.17 (4); to amend 343.03 (3) (a), 343.03 (3) (b), 343.03 (3) (c), 343.03 (3) (d), 343.03 (3) (e), 343.10 (7) (d), 343.17 (2), 343.18 (1) and 343.315 (2) (f) 7.; and to create 343.17 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: special restrictions cards issued with certain motor vehicle operator's licenses. (FE)
Title
Special restrictions cards issued with certain motor vehicle operator's licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 77 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-27 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-05-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-05-08 | House | Introduced |