WI AB207 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.65 (2) (am) 1., 346.65 (2) (am) 2., 346.65 (2) (bm), 346.65 (2g) (a), 346.65 (2g) (ag), 346.65 (2g) (d) and 346.65 (7); and to create 346.65 (2) (am) 1m. of the statutes; relating to: penalties for driving a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for driving a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-08-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-07-27 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation |
2011-07-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab207 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB207.pdf |