WI AB206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (1) (jo) 5., 23.335 (1) (zgm) 5., 30.50 (10m) (e), 94.55 (2) (e), 94.55 (3), 94.55 (3) (c), 94.67 (15r), 340.01 (50m) (e), 350.01 (10v) (e), 885.235 (1) (d) 5., 939.22 (33) (e), 961.32 (3) (b) 2. and 967.055 (1m) (b) 5.; to amend 20.115 (7) (gc), 23.33 (4c) (a) 5., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. b., 23.335 (12) (a) 5., 23.335 (12) (b) 5., 30.681 (1) (d), 30.681 (2) (d) 1. b., 94.55 (1), 94.55 (2) (title), 94.55 (2) (a), 94.55 (2) (b) 2., 94.55 (2) (b) 3., 94.55 (2) (b) 4., 94.55 (2) (b) 5., 94.55 (2) (c), 94.67 (2), 97.02, 182.001 (3), 343.305 (8) (b) 2. g., 343.305 (8) (b) 4m. (intro.), 343.305 (8) (b) 4m. a., 343.305 (8) (b) 5. c., 346.63 (1) (d), 346.63 (2) (b) 2., 348.27 (18) (a) 1. f., 350.101 (1) (e), 350.101 (2) (d) 2., 940.09 (2) (b), 940.25 (2) (b), 941.20 (1) (bm), 961.01 (14), 961.14 (4) (t) 1., 961.32 (2m) (b), 961.32 (3) (a) 1. and 2., 961.32 (3) (b) (intro.), 961.32 (3) (b) 1., 961.32 (3) (b) 3., 961.32 (3) (b) 4., 961.32 (3) (b) 5., 961.32 (3) (c), 961.32 (3) (d), 961.34 (2) (a), 961.34 (2) (b), 961.38 (1n) (a), 961.38 (1n) (b), 961.442 (intro.) and 961.55 (9); to repeal and recreate 94.55 (title); and to create 20.115 (7) (f), 94.55 (2) (am), 94.55 (2) (b) 2m., 94.55 (2) (b) 4g., 94.55 (2) (b) 4m., 94.55 (2) (b) 4s., 94.55 (2) (f), 94.55 (2g), 94.55 (2m), 94.55 (2p), 94.55 (2r), 94.55 (2t), 94.55 (3m), 94.55 (3r), 94.55 (3w), 94.67 (15c), 961.01 (3r), 961.14 (4) (t) 3., 961.32 (3) (b) 4m., 961.32 (3) (b) 4r. and 961.32 (3) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: regulating hemp, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Regulating hemp, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-12 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-11-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-11-04 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-16 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2019-10-02 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2019-10-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-14 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-08-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kurtz and Considine |
2019-07-22 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2019-07-12 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2019-06-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-12 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-06-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab206 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB206.pdf |