WI AB206 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: creating a committee to study the uses of industrial hemp.
Title
Creating a committee to study the uses of industrial hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Agriculture, Ayes 6, Noes 5 | |
2010-02-01 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Agriculture, Ayes 6, Noes 5 | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-20 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr., Garthwaite, Vruwink and Danou | |
2009-11-12 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-22 | Withdrawn from committee on Rural Economic Development and referred to committee on Agriculture pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rural Economic Development | |
2009-04-14 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab206 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB206.pdf |