WI AB205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 7 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Presented to the Governor on 12-6-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 16.84 (5); and to create 16.84 (5) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: state leases for real property. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State leases for real property. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06HousePresented to the Governor on 12-6-2017
2017-11-07HouseReport correctly enrolled on 11-7-2017
2017-10-31HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2017-10-31SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-10-31SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2017-10-31SenateRules suspended
2017-10-31SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-10-31SenateRead a second time
2017-10-27SenatePlaced on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-10-27SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-06-23SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-06-23SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2017-06-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-06-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-06-21HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-06-21HouseRules suspended
2017-06-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-06-21HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2017-06-21HouseRead a second time
2017-06-14HousePlaced on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-05-23HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-05-23HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 4
2017-05-23HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 3
2017-05-17HouseExecutive action taken
2017-05-17HouseRepresentative Knodl added as a coauthor
2017-05-16HouseAssembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Zamarripa
2017-05-16HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Zamarripa
2017-05-16HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Zamarripa
2017-05-15HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Doyle and Hutton
2017-05-03HousePublic hearing held
2017-04-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-04-05HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2017-04-05HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback