WI AB203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.14 (2) (j); and to create 343.01 (2) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: indication of veteran status on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)
Title
Indication of veteran status on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-22 | House | Representatives Milroy and Shelton added as coauthors |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sortwell and Murphy |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sortwell and Murphy |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-22 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 6-22-2021 |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-06-16 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-06-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-05-20 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2021-05-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2021-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced |