WI AB201 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 343.31 (2t) (a) 1.; to amend 343.30 (1), 343.31 (2t) (a) (intro.), 343.31 (2t) (b), 346.17 (1), 346.17 (2), 346.30 (1) (b) 1., 346.36 (1), 346.43 (1) (b) 1., 346.49 (1) (a) and 346.95 (1); and to create 343.31 (2t) (c), 346.17 (6), 346.30 (5), 346.36 (3), 346.43 (4), 346.49 (5) and 346.95 (13) of the statutes; Relating to: traffic violations requiring operating privilege suspension and attendance at a vehicle right-of-way course, increasing penalties for numerous traffic violations, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Traffic violations requiring operating privilege suspension and attendance at a vehicle right-of-way course, increasing penalties for numerous traffic violations, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | House | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 105 |
2017-11-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2017 |
2017-11-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-07-24 | House | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 4 |
2017-06-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-17 | House | Senator Testin added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced |