WI AB201 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.67 (1) (intro.) and 346.67 (1) (c); and to create 346.67 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: the duty to stop at the scene of a motor vehicle accident.
Title
The duty to stop at the scene of a motor vehicle accident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 319 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wachs |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:06 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2015-12-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-11-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-13 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced |