WI AB201 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on November 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-08 - Published 11-9-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on November 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-08 - Published 11-9-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.11 (47m) of the statutes; Relating to: giving certain veterans priority in registering for courses at the University of Wisconsin System.
Title
Giving certain veterans priority in registering for courses at the University of Wisconsin System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-08 | House | Published 11-9-2013 |
2013-11-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-8-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 56 |
2013-11-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-7-2013 |
2013-10-22 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2013 |
2013-10-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-06-06 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-06 | House | Representatives Vruwink, Ringhand, Ripp, Spiros, Mursau, Krug, J. Ott, Kuglitsch, Petersen, Tranel, Marklein, Klenke, Steineke, Strachota, Endsley, Doyle, Hintz, Richards, Johnson, Jacque and Suder added as coauthors |
2013-06-06 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 1 |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-06 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-06-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-06-06 | House | Read a second time |
2013-06-04 | House | Placed on calendar 6-6-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-06-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Petryk and Hesselbein |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-30 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-05-30 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-05-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2013-05-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Nass, Ballweg and Hesselbein |
2013-05-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hesselbein and Nass |
2013-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2013-05-15 | House | Introduced |