WI AB200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 77.54 (69) and 77.54 (70) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and use tax exemptions for precious metals and cryptocurrency. (FE)
Title
Sales and use tax exemptions for precious metals and cryptocurrency. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-09 | House | Senator Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2019-07-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2019-05-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab200 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB200.pdf |