WI AB20 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.54 (30) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: the sales and use tax exemption for electricity and natural gas sold for residential use. (FE)
Title
The sales and use tax exemption for electricity and natural gas sold for residential use. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-05-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |