WI AB20 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.07 (1g) (intro.), 343.07 (3) and 343.085 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle instruction permit and probationary license eligibility and duration. (FE)
Title
Motor vehicle instruction permit and probationary license eligibility and duration. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2021-05-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pronschinske |
2021-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-02 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced |