WI AB2 | 2018 | March Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 15.253 (3), 20.455 (2) (im), 20.923 (4) (c) 6., 118.07 (4) (cm), 165.28 and 230.08 (2) (wc) of the statutes; Relating to: creating an office of school safety in the Department of Justice and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creating an office of school safety in the Department of Justice and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen |
2018-03-20 | House | LRB correction |
2018-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/mr8/asm/bill/ab2 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/MR8/AB2.pdf |