WI AB2 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - Published 3-17-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - Published 3-17-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.75 (1) (a) 1. and 16.75 (6) (bm) and (e); and to create 16.705 (1r) of the statutes; relating to: state procurement of contractual services.
Title
State procurement of contractual services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Published 3-17-2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 136 | |
2010-03-02 | Presented to the Governor on 3-2-2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-01-21 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-01-21 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-21 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-01-21 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-21 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-21 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-19 | Placed on calendar 1-21-2010 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-04-23 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-04-23 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Small Business, Emergency Preparedness, Technical Colleges, and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2009-04-23 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Small Business, Emergency Preparedness, Technical Colleges, and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Small Business, Emergency Preparedness, Technical Colleges, and Consumer Protection | |
2009-04-23 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2009-01-28 | Read first time and referred to committee on Small Business, Emergency Preparedness, Technical Colleges, and Consumer Protection | |
2009-01-27 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-01-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-01-27 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 69, Noes 30 | |
2009-01-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-01-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-01-27 | Assembly amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 52, Noes 47 | |
2009-01-27 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Petersen and Zipperer | |
2009-01-27 | Assembly amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 50, Noes 49 | |
2009-01-27 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Zipperer, Strachota and Krusick | |
2009-01-27 | Refused to adopt Assembly amendment 1, Ayes 47, Noes 52 | |
2009-01-27 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Zipperer and Ballweg | |
2009-01-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-01-23 | Placed on calendar 1-27-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-01-23 | Report passage recommended by committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business, Ayes 9, Noes 2 | |
2009-01-21 | Executive action taken | |
2009-01-21 | Public hearing held | |
2009-01-21 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-01-21 | Senator Taylor added as a cosponsor | |
2009-01-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business | |
2009-01-16 | Introduced |