WI AB199 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.445 (1) (b) and 20.445 (1) (bm); and to create 106.275 of the statutes; Relating to: technical education equipment grants for school districts, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Technical education equipment grants for school districts, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2017-06-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-09 | House | Representative Snyder added as a coauthor |
2017-05-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab199 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB199.pdf |