WI AB195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 118.193 (2) (b); to amend 118.193 (2) (intro.); and to create 118.193 (2) (b) 2. and 118.193 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: a license to teach based on reciprocity and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
A license to teach based on reciprocity and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 43 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-11 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2019-10-11 | House | LRB correction |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Tranel and L. Myers |
2019-05-31 | House | Representative Quinn added as a coauthor |
2019-05-30 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2019-05-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced |