WI AB192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 49.45 (29y) (d); and to amend 49.45 (29y) (a) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: mental health clinical consultations under the Medical Assistance program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Mental health clinical consultations under the Medical Assistance program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 88 |
2020-02-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-27-2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-10-31 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2019-10-31 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2019-10-29 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Medicaid Reform and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-29 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Medicaid Reform and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-08-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste |
2019-06-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste |
2019-05-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Medicaid Reform and Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |