WI AB19 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 15.197 (20), 20.435 (1) (cd) and 255.45 of the statutes; Relating to: spinal cord injury research grants and symposia and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Spinal cord injury research grants and symposia and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:27 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2024-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly 42 (3)(c) |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2023-10-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-10-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2023-08-18 | House | Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor |
2023-08-14 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2023-08-10 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2023-08-08 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2023-08-07 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-08-01 | House | Representatives Billings and Hong added as coauthors |
2023-07-27 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-03-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-29 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2023-03-29 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2023-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2023-03-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-10 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-03-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-08 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |