WI AB188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Published 6-29-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Published 6-29-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 46.22 (1) (b) 5m. d., 46.22 (2g) (d) 4., 46.23 (5) (n) 3. and 301.031; to amend 13.94 (1) (v), 46.011 (1p), 46.21 (2) (j), 46.215 (3), 46.23 (5) (c) 3., 46.23 (5m) (c), 48.023 (4), 48.527, 48.66 (1) (b), 49.11 (1c), 49.45 (25) (bj), 101.123 (1) (ac) 2., 301.01 (1n), 301.027, 301.373, 938.02 (4), 938.02 (15g), 938.22 (1) (a), 938.22 (2) (d) 2., 938.33 (1) (c), 938.33 (3r), 938.34 (4m) (intro.), 938.34 (4n) (intro.), 938.355 (2) (b) 1., 938.355 (2) (b) 2., 938.355 (2) (b) 6m., 938.357 (3) (b) (intro.) and (c), 938.357 (4g) (a), 938.48 (3), 938.48 (4), 938.48 (4m) (b), 938.48 (5), 938.48 (6), 938.48 (14), 938.505 (1), 938.52 (2) (a) and (c), 938.53, 938.533 (2) (intro.), 938.54, 938.57 (4) and 938.78 (3); to repeal and recreate 938.34 (4m) (intro.); to create 46.057 (1m), 938.33 (6), 938.355 (2) (b) 2m., 938.355 (2) (b) 6n., 938.357 (3) (e) and (f) and 938.357 (4) (as) of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 38, 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 70, 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (1) (a), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (2) (a), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (3) (c), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (a) 1. c., 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (d), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (e), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (f), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (6) (e), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (7), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (7m) (b), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 111 (3) and 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 112 (1); Relating to: facilities for holding juveniles in secure custody. (FE)
Title
Facilities for holding juveniles in secure custody. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Published 6-29-2019 |
2019-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 6-28-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 8 |
2019-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-28-2019 |
2019-06-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-27-2019 |
2019-06-27 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2019-06-26 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-26-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor |
2019-06-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Tauchen |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Schraa |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Schraa |
2019-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Tauchen |
2019-06-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Schraa, Goyke, Bowen and Crowley |
2019-06-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |