WI AB188 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.79 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: removing FoodShare benefits from an inactive account and expunging unused benefits after one year. (FE)
Title
Removing FoodShare benefits from an inactive account and expunging unused benefits after one year. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] |
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] |
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Dave Heaton [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Dean Knudson [R] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. Adam Neylon [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] |
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 66, Noes 31 |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 36 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Jorgensen and Spreitzer |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2015-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2015-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2015-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jorgensen |
2015-09-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |