WI AB187 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.164 (3m) (title); and to create 29.164 (3m) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption for disabled veterans and recipients of the purple heart medal from the cumulative preference system for issuing wild turkey hunting licenses and tags.
Title
An exemption for disabled veterans and recipients of the purple heart medal from the cumulative preference system for issuing wild turkey hunting licenses and tags.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Representatives Meyers and Macco added as coauthors |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-08-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-08-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-08-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-07-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-07-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-28 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2015-05-20 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab187 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB187.pdf |