WI AB186 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the police and fire protection fee imposed on certain communications services. (FE)
Title
The police and fire protection fee imposed on certain communications services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2013-05-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab186 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB186.pdf |