WI AB183 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 49.45 (2) (a) 11. a.; and to create 49.45 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: certification of abortion providers under the Medical Assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certification of abortion providers under the Medical Assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-06-24HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 6-21-2019
2019-06-20HousePresented to the Governor on 6-20-2019
2019-06-06HouseReport correctly enrolled on 6-6-2019
2019-06-06HouseLRB correction
2019-06-05HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2019-06-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-05SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2019-06-05SenateRules suspended
2019-06-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2019-06-05SenateRead a second time
2019-06-04SenateRepresentative Pronschinske added as a coauthor
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-06-03SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-05-23SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
2019-05-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-16SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-05-16SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-05-15HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 32
2019-05-15HouseRules suspended
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-05-15HouseRead a second time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-05-09HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-05-09HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 8, Noes 5
2019-05-09HouseExecutive action taken
2019-05-07HousePublic hearing held
2019-04-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2019-04-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback