WI AB183 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 321.06 of the statutes; Relating to: task force on issues concerning service members returning home from war. (FE)
Title
Task force on issues concerning service members returning home from war. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-20 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2015-05-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab183 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB183.pdf |