WI AB182 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 234.03 (2m), 234.40 (4), 234.50 (4), 234.60 (2), 234.61 (1) and 234.65 (1) (b); and to create 234.57, 301.069 and 895.493 of the statutes; Relating to: a certification of rental readiness and funding to cover damages caused by certification of rental readiness holders. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A certification of rental readiness and funding to cover damages caused by certification of rental readiness holders. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-26SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
2024-02-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2024-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2024-02-22HouseRead a third time and passed
2024-02-22HouseRules suspended
2024-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2024-02-22HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2024-02-22HouseRead a second time
2024-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 10:09 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2024-02-14HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-02-14HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 2
2024-02-14HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2024-01-31HouseExecutive action taken
2024-01-19HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa
2023-10-03HousePublic hearing held
2023-05-31HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-05-15HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-04-20HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Corrections
2023-04-20HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback