WI AB181 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (5) (cx), 23.33 (5m) (title), (a) and (b) (intro.), 23.33 (5m) (b) 2. to 6., 23.33 (5m) (c) (intro.) and 1., 23.33 (5m) (c) 3. to 7. and 23.33 (5m) (d); and to create 23.33 (5m) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for the all-terrain vehicle and utility terrain vehicle safety enhancement program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for the all-terrain vehicle and utility terrain vehicle safety enhancement program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2017-05-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab181 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB181.pdf |