WI AB181 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.03 (13) (o); and to create 343.14 (2) (k) and 343.21 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: waiving operator's license fees for disabled veterans. (FE)
Title
Waiving operator's license fees for disabled veterans. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2015-05-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab181 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB181.pdf |