WI AB180 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 6.86 (2) (a), 6.86 (2) (b) and 12.60 (1) (a); and to create 12.13 (3) (ig) of the statutes; Relating to: status as an indefinitely confined voter for purposes of receiving absentee ballots automatically and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Status as an indefinitely confined voter for purposes of receiving absentee ballots automatically and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2021-05-19HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a coauthor
2021-05-11HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-04-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-03-23HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback