WI AB180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 350.12 (3j) (bg) 2. and 350.12 (4) (bg) 2. a.; to renumber and amend 350.12 (4) (bg) 2. b.; and to amend 350.12 (3j) (b), 350.12 (3j) (bg) 3., 350.12 (3j) (bg) 4., 350.12 (3j) (e) 2., 350.12 (4) (b) 1., 350.12 (4) (bm) 1. and 350.12 (4) (bm) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: snowmobile trail use stickers and trail aids and supplemental trail aids for snowmobile trail maintenance. (FE)
Title
Snowmobile trail use stickers and trail aids and supplemental trail aids for snowmobile trail maintenance. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-06 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2017-03-30 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab180 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB180.pdf |