WI AB180 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (4p) (b) 4., 30.684 (2) (d), 343.305 (5) (b), 346.65 (2) (am) 6., 346.65 (2) (am) 7., 346.65 (3m) and 350.104 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: penalties and testing for operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties and testing for operating-while-intoxicated offenses and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 224 |
2014-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-31-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 2 was not germane well taken |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 1 was not germane well taken |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 1 |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to calendar of 5-14-2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-05-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2013-05-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2013-05-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-09 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2013-05-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2013-05-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hebl |
2013-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-29 | House | Introduced |