WI AB18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: adopting federal law changes to extend the time for filing individual income tax returns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting federal law changes to extend the time for filing individual income tax returns.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-04-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-04-14SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-04-13HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-04-13HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2021-04-13HouseRead a third time and passed
2021-04-13HouseRules suspended
2021-04-13HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-04-13HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
2021-04-13HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Wittke and Macco
2021-04-13HouseRead a second time
2021-04-13HousePlaced at the foot of the calendar of 4-13-2021
2021-04-12HouseRepresentative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
2021-04-12HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Wittke and Macco
2021-04-08HousePlaced on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-25HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-25HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2021-03-18HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-02HousePublic hearing held
2021-02-02HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2021-01-29HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback