WI AB18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 346.65 (2) (f) 1. and 346.65 (2g) (d); to renumber and amend 346.65 (2) (am) 1. and 346.65 (2) (f) 2.; to amend 343.30 (1q) (b) (intro.), 343.30 (1q) (b) 3., 343.305 (10) (b) 3., 343.31 (3) (bm) 3., 345.20 (2) (c), 345.24 (1), 346.65 (2) (am) 2., 346.65 (2) (bm), 346.65 (2c), 346.65 (2e), 346.65 (2g) (a), 346.65 (2g) (ag), 346.65 (2g) (am), 346.65 (2i), 939.51 (1) (intro.) and 972.11 (3m); and to create 346.65 (2) (am) 1. b., c. and d. of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for offenses related to operating a vehicle while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for offenses related to operating a vehicle while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Emerson and Crowley |
2019-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-04 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2019-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab18 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB18.pdf |