WI AB18 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 125.51 (2) (am) and 125.54 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: taste samples of intoxicating liquor provided on certain retail licensed premises.
Title
Taste samples of intoxicating liquor provided on certain retail licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 10 |
2015-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2015 |
2015-03-20 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-20-2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-02-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-02-12 | House | Representative Zepnick added as a coauthor |
2015-02-12 | House | Read a second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced |