WI AB178 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 321.03 (1) (f) and 321.04 (1) (s) of the statutes; Relating to: annual reporting to the legislature of sexual harassment and assault that occurs in the Wisconsin National Guard and of changes to the Uniform Code of Military Justice.
Title
Annual reporting to the legislature of sexual harassment and assault that occurs in the Wisconsin National Guard and of changes to the Uniform Code of Military Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |