WI AB178 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 757.69 (1) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing court commissioners to issue search warrants for certain civil violations. (FE)
Title
Allowing court commissioners to issue search warrants for certain civil violations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-06-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab178 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB178.pdf |