WI AB178 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 236.45 (2) (ac) and 236.45 (2) (b); and to create 236.45 (2) (c) of the statutes; relating to: the authority of a county to enact ordinances governing certain land divisions. (FE)
Title
The authority of a county to enact ordinances governing certain land divisions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-08-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-06-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2011-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab178 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB178.pdf |