WI AB177 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (4) (cm), 49.79 (7m), 227.01 (13) (tm) and 253.06 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: limiting the foods that may be purchased under FoodShare; requiring a report on the cost to implement and comply with the food limitations; requiring review, updating, and publication of the list of authorized foods; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Limiting the foods that may be purchased under FoodShare; requiring a report on the cost to implement and comply with the food limitations; requiring review, updating, and publication of the list of authorized foods; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 19 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 18 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 19 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 18 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Messaged pursuant to Assembly Rule 50 (1) |
2015-05-13 | House | Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 19 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 19 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 18 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 32 |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 18 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 17 adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 7 adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a second time |
2015-05-12 | House | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 17 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 7 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 7 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2015-05-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 7 offered by Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 17 offered by Representative Novak |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 16 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 15 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 14 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 13 offered by Representatives Subeck, Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste and Spreitzer |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 12 offered by Representatives Kolste, Jorgensen, Goyke, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 11 offered by Representatives Subeck, Jorgensen, Kolste, Goyke and Spreitzer |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 10 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 9 offered by Representatives Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 8 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-04-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-27 | House | Senator Stroebel added as a cosponsor |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |