WI AB176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.98 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: adopting a provision of the Internal Revenue Code related to the tax-free distribution from an individual retirement account to a qualified charitable organization. (FE)
Title
Adopting a provision of the Internal Revenue Code related to the tax-free distribution from an individual retirement account to a qualified charitable organization. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions |
2017-06-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 1 |
2017-06-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-01 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2017-05-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-04 | House | Representative Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2017-05-02 | House | Representative Bernier added as a coauthor |
2017-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab176 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB176.pdf |