WI AB175 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grants to independent living centers and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to independent living centers and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2022-02-21 | House | Representative Sinicki added as a coauthor |
2022-02-16 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2022-01-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-04 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2021-11-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-16 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2021-09-22 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced |