WI AB175 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.20 (2r) of the statutes; Relating to: causing bodily harm to a nurse and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Causing bodily harm to a nurse and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2020-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-11-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Crowley, Stubbs and McGuire |
2019-10-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Magnafici |
2019-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2019-09-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-06 | House | Representative Fields added as a coauthor |
2019-05-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab175 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB175.pdf |