WI AB175 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 11.33 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: communications by members of the legislature.
Title
Communications by members of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Local Government |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2016-01-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2016-01-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Vorpagel |
2016-01-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Vorpagel |
2015-05-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vorpagel |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab175 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB175.pdf |