WI AB175 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (6) (a) 9. and 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. d. of the statutes; relating to: expanding the life of a tax incremental district in the city of Racine.
Title
Expanding the life of a tax incremental district in the city of Racine.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Barca [D] | Sen. Spencer Coggs [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Rep. Cory Mason [D] |
Sen. Jeffrey Plale [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] | Sen. Robert Wirch [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-10-29 | Laid on the table | |
2009-10-29 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Gottlieb, Vos and LeMahieu | |
2009-10-29 | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 10-29-2009 | |
2009-10-27 | Placed on calendar 10-29-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-27 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-27 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | |
2009-10-27 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-22 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-07 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-06 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Mason | |
2009-04-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2009-03-30 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab175 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB175.pdf |