WI AB173 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (5) (bo) of the statutes; relating to: the method by which the Department of Revenue makes certain calculations regarding tax incremental financing district number 4 in the village of Elmwood.
Title
The method by which the Department of Revenue makes certain calculations regarding tax incremental financing district number 4 in the village of Elmwood.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-02 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2010-03-02 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on calendar 3-2-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-02-25 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-24 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-24 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken | |
2009-11-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-11-06 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up | |
2009-11-04 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Murtha | |
2009-06-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-06-16 | Report passage recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-06-02 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-07 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2009-03-30 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab173 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB173.pdf |